US HB5992 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
Pending: House Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
Pending: House Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Extends the Radiation Exposure Compensation Trust Fund for five years. In addition, the bill expands eligibility for relief for individuals who were exposed to atmospheric nuclear testing and subsequently developed specified cancers. Specifically, the bill extends eligibility to qualified individuals who were exposed in any part of Clark County, Nevada, or Mohave County, Arizona.
Title
Downwinders Parity Act of 2020
Sponsors
Rep. Greg Stanton [D-AZ] | Rep. Paul Gosar [R-AZ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties. |
2020-02-27 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2020-02-27 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB776 (Related) 2019-03-13 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HB757 (Related) 2019-03-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
HB757 (Related) 2019-03-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
Subjects
Arizona
Cancer
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Civil actions and liability
Digestive and metabolic diseases
Labor and employment
Nevada
Nuclear weapons
Radiation
Cancer
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Civil actions and liability
Digestive and metabolic diseases
Labor and employment
Nevada
Nuclear weapons
Radiation
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/5992/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr5992/BILLS-116hr5992ih.pdf |