US HB7516 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 1 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Subcommittee Hearings Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Subcommittee Hearings Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Indian Health Care Improvement Act to address liability for payment of charges or costs associated with provision of purchased/referred care services, and for other purposes.
Title
Purchased and Referred Care Improvement Act of 2024
Sponsors
Rep. Dusty Johnson [R-SD] | Rep. Kim Schrier [D-WA] | Rep. Cathy McMorris Rodgers [R-WA] | Rep. Teresa Fernandez [D-NM] |
Rep. Ryan Zinke [R-MT] | Rep. Dan Newhouse [R-WA] | Rep. Sharice Davids [D-KS] | Rep. Donald Davis [D-NC] |
Rep. Tom Cole [R-OK] | Rep. Melanie Stansbury [D-NM] | Rep. Mary Peltola [D-AK] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-30 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held |
2024-04-29 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Indian and Insular Affairs. |
2024-03-08 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2024-03-01 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2024-03-01 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB3797 (Related) 2024-02-12 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/house-bill/7516/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/hr7516/BILLS-118hr7516ih.pdf |