US HB7433 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-10 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-10 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Homeland Security Act of 2002 to establish a transnational repression hotline and conduct a transnational repression public service announcement campaign, and for other purposes.
Title
Law Enforcement Support and Transnational Repression Hotline Act
Sponsors
Rep. Anthony D'Esposito [R-NY] | Rep. Seth Magaziner [D-RI] | Rep. August Pfluger [R-TX] | Rep. Clay Higgins [R-LA] |
Rep. Andrew Garbarino [R-NY] | Rep. Nick LaLota [R-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-10 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2024-04-10 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held |
2024-04-10 | House | Committee Hearings Held |
2024-03-07 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held |
2024-03-07 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote. |
2024-02-27 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Counterterrorism, Law Enforcement, and Intelligence. |
2024-02-23 | House | Referred to the Committee on Homeland Security, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2024-02-23 | House | Introduced in House |
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/house-bill/7433/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/hr7433/BILLS-118hr7433ih.pdf |