US HB7416 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-4)
Status: Introduced on June 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Maritime Transportation.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Maritime Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Maritime Transportation.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Maritime Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend title 46, United States Code, to allow the Administrator of the Maritime Administration to provide assistance to the owners and operators of certain ports and terminals, and for other purposes.
Title
Coastal and Inland Ports and Terminals Commerce Improvement Act
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Bost [R-IL] | Rep. Conor Lamb [D-PA] | Rep. Bob Gibbs [R-OH] | Rep. Guy Reschenthaler [R-PA] |
Rep. Vicky Hartzler [R-MO] | Rep. David Loebsack [D-IA] | Rep. Carol Miller [R-WV] | Rep. Daniel Lipinski [D-IL] |
Rep. Eric Crawford [R-AR] | Rep. Jason Smith [R-MO] | Rep. Rodney Davis [R-IL] | Rep. Ralph Abraham [R-LA] |
Rep. Lacy Clay [D-MO] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-01 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Maritime Transportation. |
2020-06-30 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
2020-06-30 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB6395 (Related) 2021-01-02 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
HR1271 (Related) 2020-12-21 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR1271 (Related) 2020-12-21 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Accounting and auditing
Economic performance and conditions
Financial services and investments
Government lending and loan guarantees
Infrastructure development
Marine and inland water transportation
Navigation, waterways, harbors
Performance measurement
Public-private cooperation
Transportation and public works
Economic performance and conditions
Financial services and investments
Government lending and loan guarantees
Infrastructure development
Marine and inland water transportation
Navigation, waterways, harbors
Performance measurement
Public-private cooperation
Transportation and public works
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/7416/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr7416/BILLS-116hr7416ih.pdf |