US HB7310 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on November 18 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-11-18 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 18 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-11-18 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To require the Assistant Secretary of Commerce for Communications and Information to submit to Congress a plan for the modernization of the information technology systems of the National Telecommunications and Information Administration, and for other purposes.
Title
Spectrum IT Modernization Act of 2020
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Doyle [D-PA] | Rep. Robert Latta [R-OH] | Rep. Rick Larsen [D-WA] | Rep. Tim Walberg [R-MI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-18 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
2020-11-17 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-11-17 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5825-5826) |
2020-11-17 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 7310. |
2020-11-17 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5825-5827) |
2020-11-17 | House | Mr. Pallone moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2020-11-17 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 490. |
2020-11-17 | House | Committee on Armed Services discharged. |
2020-11-17 | House | Reported by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 116-592, Part I. |
2020-07-15 | House | Subcommittee on Communications and Technology Discharged. |
2020-07-15 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2020-07-15 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2020-06-25 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology. |
2020-06-24 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-06-24 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-06-24 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB4049 (Related) 2020-08-07 - Held at the desk.
HB6395 (Related) 2021-01-02 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
SB3717 (Same As) 2020-05-20 - Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
HR1271 (Related) 2020-12-21 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB6395 (Related) 2021-01-02 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
SB3717 (Same As) 2020-05-20 - Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
HR1271 (Related) 2020-12-21 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Advanced technology and technological innovations
Computer security and identity theft
Computers and information technology
Congressional oversight
Government operations and politics
Government studies and investigations
Homeland security
Computer security and identity theft
Computers and information technology
Congressional oversight
Government operations and politics
Government studies and investigations
Homeland security