US HB7260 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 27-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-06 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (H4202)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-06 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (H4202)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To require a comprehensive southern border strategy, and for other purposes.
Title
Comprehensive Southern Border Strategy Act
Sponsors
Rep. Young Kim [R-CA] | Rep. Michael Guest [R-MS] | Rep. Andrew Garbarino [R-NY] | Sen. Markwayne Mullin [R-OK] |
Rep. Mariannette Miller-Meeks [R-IA] | Rep. Rodney Davis [R-IL] | Rep. Jacob Laturner [R-KS] | Rep. Troy Nehls [R-TX] |
Rep. Kevin Brady [R-TX] | Rep. Kay Granger [R-TX] | Rep. Jeff Van Drew [R-NJ] | Rep. Ken Buck [R-CO] |
Rep. Jake Ellzey [R-TX] | Rep. Randy Weber [R-TX] | Rep. Dan Crenshaw [R-TX] | Rep. Tom Rice [R-SC] |
Rep. Ralph Norman [R-SC] | Rep. Gus Bilirakis [R-FL] | Rep. Roger Williams [R-TX] | Rep. Dan Meuser [R-PA] |
Rep. Carlos Gimenez [R-FL] | Rep. Gary Palmer [R-AL] | Rep. Michelle Steel [R-CA] | Rep. Vicky Hartzler [R-MO] |
Rep. John Katko [R-NY] | Rep. Jaime Herrera Beutler [R-WA] | Rep. Jay Obernolte [R-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-06 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (H4202) |
2022-03-30 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Oversight, Management, and Accountability. |
2022-03-30 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Border Security, Facilitation, and Operations. |
2022-03-29 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Homeland Security. |
2022-03-29 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB1707 (Related) 2021-05-18 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
SB4642 (Same As) 2022-07-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
SB4642 (Same As) 2022-07-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/7260/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr7260/BILLS-117hr7260ih.pdf |