US HB7199 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on November 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-11-25 - Became Public Law No: 118-127.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on November 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-11-25 - Became Public Law No: 118-127.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at S74w16860 Janesville Road, in Muskego, Wisconsin, as the "Colonel Hans Christian Heg Post Office".
Title
To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at S74w16860 Janesville Road, in Muskego, Wisconsin, as the "Colonel Hans Christian Heg Post Office".
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Fitzgerald [R-WI] | Rep. Bryan Steil [R-WI] | Rep. Tom Tiffany [R-WI] | Rep. Glenn Grothman [R-WI] |
Rep. Derrick Van Orden [R-WI] | Rep. Mike Gallagher [R-WI] | Rep. Gwen Moore [D-WI] | Rep. Mark Pocan [D-WI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-11-25 | House | Became Public Law No: 118-127. |
2024-11-25 | House | Signed by President. |
2024-11-21 | House | Presented to President. |
2024-11-20 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2024-11-19 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6626) |
2024-08-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 467. |
2024-08-01 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Peters without amendment. Without written report. |
2024-07-31 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2024-06-04 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
2024-06-03 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2024-06-03 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H3560) |
2024-06-03 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 7199. |
2024-06-03 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3560-3561) |
2024-06-03 | House | Mr. Grothman moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2024-04-10 | House | Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 37 - 1. |
2024-04-10 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2024-03-07 | House | Defeated Measure by Unanimous Consent. |
2024-03-07 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held |
2024-02-01 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Accountability. |
2024-02-01 | House | Introduced in House |