US HB7180 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 4 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-04 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 4 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-04 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 80 1st Street in Kingsland, Arkansas, as the "Kingsland 'Johnny Cash' Post Office".
Title
To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 80 1st Street in Kingsland, Arkansas, as the "Kingsland 'Johnny Cash' Post Office".
Sponsors
Rep. Bruce Westerman [R-AR] | Rep. Steve Womack [R-AR] | Rep. French Hill [R-AR] | Rep. Eric Crawford [R-AR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-04 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
2024-06-03 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2024-06-03 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. |
2024-06-03 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 7180. |
2024-06-03 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. |
2024-06-03 | House | Mr. Grothman moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2024-04-10 | House | Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 37 - 1. |
2024-04-10 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2024-03-07 | House | Motion to Report Measure Defeated by Unanimous Consent. |
2024-03-07 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held |
2024-01-31 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Accountability. |
2024-01-31 | House | Introduced in House |