US HB7151 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on September 10 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-09-10 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 10 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-09-10 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Export Control Reform Act of 2018 to provide for expedited consideration of proposals for additions to, removals from, or other modifications with respect to entities on the Entity List, and for other purposes.
Title
Export Control Enforcement and Enhancement Act
Sponsors
Rep. Ann Wagner [R-MO] | Rep. Michael McCaul [R-TX] | Rep. Michael Lawler [R-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-09-10 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. |
2024-09-09 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2024-09-09 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5083) |
2024-09-09 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 7151. |
2024-09-09 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5083-5084) |
2024-09-09 | House | Mrs. Wagner moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2024-07-11 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2024-07-10 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held |
2024-01-30 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
2024-01-30 | House | Introduced in House |