US HB7140 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-0)
Status: Introduced on June 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-08 - Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services.
Pending: House Armed Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-08 - Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services.
Pending: House Armed Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits the use of federal funds for FY2021 to conduct or make preparations for any explosive nuclear weapons test that produces any yield.
Title
PLANET Act Preserving Leadership Against Nuclear Explosives Testing Act
Sponsors
Rep. Dina Titus [D-NV] | Rep. Steven Horsford [D-NV] | Rep. Don Beyer [D-VA] | Rep. Tulsi Gabbard [D-HI] |
Rep. Ruben Gallego [D-AZ] | Rep. Denny Heck [D-WA] | Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA] | Rep. Joseph Kennedy [D-MA] |
Rep. James McGovern [D-MA] | Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA] | Rep. Bobby Rush [D-IL] | Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR] |
Rep. Pramila Jayapal [D-WA] | Rep. Jesus Garcia [D-IL] | Rep. Suzanne Lee [D-NV] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] |
Rep. Ilhan Omar [D-MN] | Rep. Angela Craig [D-MN] | Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] | Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA] |
Rep. Mark Pocan [D-WI] | Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] | Rep. Ben McAdams [D-UT] | Rep. Jerrold Nadler [D-NY] |
Rep. Marcy Kaptur [D-OH] | Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-08 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services. |
2020-06-08 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB3886 (Related) 2020-06-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
SB4045 (Related) 2020-06-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
HB7260 (Related) 2020-06-18 - Referred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
SB4045 (Related) 2020-06-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
HB7260 (Related) 2020-06-18 - Referred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Military procurement, research, weapons development
Nuclear weapons
Military procurement, research, weapons development
Nuclear weapons
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/7140/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr7140/BILLS-116hr7140ih.pdf |