US HB7125 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Introduced on June 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-08 - Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services.
Pending: House Armed Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-08 - Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services.
Pending: House Armed Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To direct the Secretary of Defense to enter into an agreement with a federally funded research and development center for a study on the barriers to minority participation in the elite units of the Armed Forces, and for other purposes.
Title
ELITE Act of 2020 Equality in Leadership and Inclusion in Top Elements Act of 2020
Sponsors
Rep. Anthony Brown [D-MD] | Rep. Michael Turner [R-OH] | Rep. Trent Kelly [R-MS] | Rep. Gwen Moore [D-WI] |
Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Elaine Luria [D-VA] | Rep. Pete Aguilar [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-08 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services. |
2020-06-08 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB4049 (Related) 2020-08-07 - Held at the desk.
SB3903 (Related) 2020-06-04 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
HB6395 (Related) 2021-01-02 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
HR1271 (Related) 2020-12-21 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB3903 (Related) 2020-06-04 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
HB6395 (Related) 2021-01-02 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
HR1271 (Related) 2020-12-21 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Congressional oversight
Government studies and investigations
Military education and training
Military personnel and dependents
Minority employment
Congressional oversight
Government studies and investigations
Military education and training
Military personnel and dependents
Minority employment
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/7125/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr7125/BILLS-116hr7125ih.pdf |