US HB7121 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Introduced on March 17 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-18 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 17 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-18 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To require the Secretary of Health and Human Services to maintain a list of the country of origin of all drugs marketed in the United States, to ban the use of Federal funds for the purchase of drugs manufactured in the People's Republic of China, and for other purposes.
Title
Protecting our Pharmaceutical Supply Chain from China Act of 2022
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Gallagher [R-WI] | Rep. Elise Stefanik [R-NY] | Rep. Liz Cheney [R-WY] | Sen. Ted Budd [R-NC] |
Rep. Jeff Van Drew [R-NJ] | Rep. Vicky Hartzler [R-MO] | Rep. Bill Posey [R-FL] | Rep. Diana Harshbarger [R-TN] |
Rep. Brian Babin [R-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-18 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2022-03-17 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Veterans' Affairs, and Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2022-03-17 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2495 (Related) 2021-07-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB3401 (Related) 2021-12-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB3401 (Related) 2021-12-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/7121/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr7121/BILLS-117hr7121ih.pdf |