US HB7109 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 114-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-10 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 22 - 20.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-10 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 22 - 20.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To require a citizenship question on the decennial census, to require reporting on certain census statistics, and to modify apportionment of Representatives to be based on United States citizens instead of all persons.
Title
Equal Representation Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-10 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 22 - 20. |
2024-04-10 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held |
2024-01-29 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Accountability. |
2024-01-29 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB6335 (Related) 2023-11-09 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Accountability.
HB6520 (Related) 2023-11-30 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Accountability.
SB3659 (Same As) 2024-01-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
HB6520 (Related) 2023-11-30 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Accountability.
SB3659 (Same As) 2024-01-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/house-bill/7109/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/hr7109/BILLS-118hr7109ih.pdf |