US HB709 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 56-1)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Insurance, Housing and Community Opportunity.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Insurance, Housing and Community Opportunity Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Insurance, Housing and Community Opportunity.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Insurance, Housing and Community Opportunity Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Urban Revitalization and Livable Communities Act - Requires the Secretary of Housing and Urban Development (HUD) to promulgate regulations establishing an urban revitalization and livable communities program to provide federal grants to eligible local governments for various park and recreation purposes, including grants for rehabilitation and construction, innovation, at-risk youth recreation, and recovery action programs. Authorizes the Secretary to authorize local governments not meeting program eligibility requirements required to be established in standard metropolitan statistical areas to receive up to a specified portion of such grants, if such a government applies for a partial eligibility waiver. Authorizes the Secretary, upon approval of an application by the chief executive of an eligible applicant, to provide 70% matching rehabilitation and construction, innovation, and at-risk youth recreation grants directly to such applicant. Allows a recipient, at its discretion, to transfer a grant in whole or in part to private nonprofit agencies for recreational areas and facilities they own or operate which offer recreational opportunities to the general population. Requires an applicant, for project approval, to submit to the Secretary evidence of its commitment to ongoing planning, rehabilitation, service, operation, and maintenance programs for its park and recreation systems, expressed in a five-year local park and recreation recovery action program. Requires an eligible applicant for an at-risk youth recreation grant to include in its five-year program the goal of, and implementation strategies for, reducing crime and juvenile delinquency. Authorizes the Secretary to increase all grants to a state under this Act by up to 15% (but not more than 85%) of total project or program cost. Prohibits the conversion of any property improved or developed with assistance under this Act, without HUD approval, for uses other than for public recreation. Limits to 10% the use of funds appropriated for rehabilitation and construction grants for acquisition of land or interests in land.
Title
Urban Revitalization and Livable Communities Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-23 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Insurance, Housing and Community Opportunity. |
2011-03-04 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Early Childhood, Elementary, and Secondary Education. |
2011-02-15 | House | Referred to House Education and the Workforce |
2011-02-15 | House | Referred to House Financial Services |
2011-02-15 | House | Referred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committee on Education and the Workforce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3583 (Related) 2012-09-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. (text of measure as introduced: CR S6549-6552)
Subjects
Child care and development
Crime prevention
Government information and archives
Housing and community development
Housing and community development funding
Juvenile crime and gang violence
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Urban and suburban affairs and development
Crime prevention
Government information and archives
Housing and community development
Housing and community development funding
Juvenile crime and gang violence
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Urban and suburban affairs and development
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/112th-congress/house-bill/709/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/112/bills/hr709/BILLS-112hr709ih.pdf |