US HB7 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 29-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 26 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-01-26 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 26 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-01-26 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
No Taxpayer Funding for Abortion and Abortion Insurance Full Disclosure Act of 2015 TITLE I--PROHIBITING FEDERALLY FUNDED ABORTIONS (Sec. 101) This bill prohibits federal funds, including funds in the budget of the District of Columbia, from being expended for abortion or health coverage that includes coverage of abortion. Abortions are eligible for federal funding only in cases of rape or incest, or where a physical condition endangers a woman's life unless an abortion is performed. Currently, federal funding of abortion and health coverage that includes abortion is prohibited, with the same exceptions. Health care provided in a federal health care facility or by a federal employee may not include abortions that are ineligible for federal funding. TITLE II--APPLICATION UNDER THE AFFORDABLE CARE ACT (Sec. 201) This bill amends the Internal Revenue Code to disallow premium assistance tax credits or health insurance tax credits for qualified health plans that cover abortions ineligible for federal funding. This bill amends the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act to require the Office of Personnel Management to ensure that multi-state qualified health plans offered on health insurance exchanges do not cover abortions ineligible for federal funding. (Sec. 202) A qualified health plan's coverage of abortion must be disclosed to enrollees at the time of enrollment and must be prominently displayed in marketing materials, comparison tools, or any summary of benefits and coverage made available by the plan issuer, a health insurance exchange, or the Department of Health and Human Services. The amount of a plan's premium that is attributable to coverage of abortions ineligible for federal funding must be disclosed in material where the premium is disclosed.
Title
No Taxpayer Funding for Abortion and Abortion Insurance Full Disclosure Act of 2015
Sponsors
Rep. Christopher Smith [R-NJ] | Rep. Daniel Lipinski [D-IL] | Rep. Joseph Pitts [R-PA] | Rep. Virginia Foxx [R-NC] |
Rep. Diane Black [R-TN] | Sen. Marsha Blackburn [R-TN] | Rep. Ann Wagner [R-MO] | Rep. Jackie Walorski [R-IN] |
Rep. Martha Roby [R-AL] | Rep. Ileana Ros-Lehtinen [R-FL] | Sen. Cynthia Lummis [R-WY] | Rep. Renee Ellmers [R-NC] |
Rep. Mimi Walters [R-CA] | Rep. Vicky Hartzler [R-MO] | Rep. Cathy McMorris Rodgers [R-WA] | Rep. Kevin McCarthy [R-CA] |
Rep. Steve Scalise [R-LA] | Rep. Patrick McHenry [R-NC] | Rep. Pete Sessions [R-TX] | Rep. Lynn Jenkins [R-KS] |
Rep. John Boehner [R-OH] | Rep. Austin Scott [R-GA] | Rep. Ted Poe [R-TX] | Rep. John Duncan [R-TN] |
Rep. Thomas Massie [R-KY] | Rep. John Culberson [R-TX] | Rep. Sam Graves [R-MO] | Rep. Alexander Mooney [R-WV] |
Rep. Rodney Davis [R-IL] | Rep. Ralph Abraham [R-LA] |
Roll Calls
2015-01-22 - House - On Passage (Y: 242 N: 179 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-22 - House - On Motion to Recommit with Instructions (Y: 177 N: 240 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-01-22 - House - On Motion to Recommit with Instructions (Y: 177 N: 240 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-26 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
2015-01-22 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2015-01-22 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2015-01-22 | House | On passage Passed by recorded vote: 242 - 179 (Roll no. 45). (text: CR H494-495) |
2015-01-22 | House | On motion to recommit with instructions Failed by the Yeas and Nays: 177 - 240 (Roll no. 44). |
2015-01-22 | House | The previous question on the motion to recommit with instructions was ordered without objection. (consideration: CR H510) |
2015-01-22 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Moore motion to recommit with instructions, pending reservation of a point order. The instructions contained in the motion seek to report the same back to the House forthwith with an amendment to clarify that no one is permitted to violate the medical privacy of any woman, including victims of rape and incest, with respect to her choice of or use of comprehensive health insurance coverage. Subsequently, the reservation of a point of order was withdrawn. |
2015-01-22 | House | Ms. Moore moved to recommit with instructions to the Committee on the Judiciary. (consideration: CR H509-510; text: CR H509) |
2015-01-22 | House | The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule. (consideration: CR H509) |
2015-01-22 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 7. |
2015-01-22 | House | Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 7 with 1 hour of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit with or without instructions. Measure will be considered read. Bill is closed to amendments. |
2015-01-22 | House | Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 42. (consideration: CR H494-511) |
2015-01-22 | House | Rule H. Res. 42 passed House. |
2015-01-22 | House | Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice Discharged. |
2015-01-21 | House | Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 42 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 7 with 1 hour of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit with or without instructions. Measure will be considered read. Bill is closed to amendments. |
2015-01-21 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2015-01-21 | House | Referred to House Ways and Means |
2015-01-21 | House | Referred to House Energy and Commerce |
2015-01-21 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2015-01-21 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice. |
2015-01-21 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HR42 (Related) 2015-01-22 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB582 (Same As) 2015-02-26 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB582 (Same As) 2015-02-26 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
Abortion
Appropriations
Assault and harassment offenses
Civil rights and liberties, minority issues
Comprehensive health care
Consumer affairs
Crimes against women
Employee benefits and pensions
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Health facilities and institutions
Health programs administration and funding
Income tax credits
Sex offenses
Small business
Appropriations
Assault and harassment offenses
Civil rights and liberties, minority issues
Comprehensive health care
Consumer affairs
Crimes against women
Employee benefits and pensions
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Health facilities and institutions
Health programs administration and funding
Income tax credits
Sex offenses
Small business