US HB6960 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-20 - Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 48 - 0.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-20 - Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 48 - 0.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Public Health Service Act to reauthorize the Emergency Medical Services for Children program.
Title
Emergency Medical Services for Children Reauthorization Act of 2024
Sponsors
Rep. Earl Carter [R-GA] | Rep. Kathy Castor [D-FL] | Rep. John Joyce [R-PA] | Rep. Kim Schrier [D-WA] |
Rep. Raul Ruiz [D-CA] | Rep. Jonathan Jackson [D-IL] | Rep. Shri Thanedar [D-MI] | Rep. Deborah Ross [D-NC] |
Rep. Chrissy Houlahan [D-PA] | Rep. Donald Davis [D-NC] | Rep. Josh Gottheimer [D-NJ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-20 | House | Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 48 - 0. |
2024-03-20 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held |
2024-03-12 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by the Yeas and Nays: 23 - 0. |
2024-03-12 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held |
2024-01-12 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2024-01-11 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2024-01-11 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB3765 (Same As) 2024-02-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/house-bill/6960/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/hr6960/BILLS-118hr6960ih.pdf |