US HB6872 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 19 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Maritime Transportation.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Maritime Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 19 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Maritime Transportation.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Maritime Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To require the Secretary of Energy to establish a grant program to support hydrogen-fueled equipment at ports and to conduct a study with the Secretary of Transportation and the Secretary of Homeland Security on the feasibility and safety of using hydrogen-derived fuels, including ammonia, as a shipping fuel.
Title
Hydrogen for Ports Act
Sponsors
Rep. Katie Porter [D-CA] | Rep. Gus Bilirakis [R-FL] | Rep. Suzan DelBene [D-WA] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] |
Rep. Scott Peters [D-CA] | Rep. Marcus Molinaro [R-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-02 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Maritime Transportation. |
2023-12-22 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment, Manufacturing, and Critical Materials. |
2023-12-19 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2023-12-19 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB647 (Related) 2023-03-02 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/house-bill/6872/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/hr6872/BILLS-118hr6872ih.pdf |