US HB6862 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on December 19 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-12 - Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute by the Yeas and Nays: 22 - 13.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 19 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-12 - Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute by the Yeas and Nays: 22 - 13.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the FAST Act to include certain mineral production activities as a covered project, and for other purposes.
Title
To amend the FAST Act to include certain mineral production activities as a covered project, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Doug Lamborn [R-CO] | Rep. Blake Moore [R-UT] | Rep. Dan Newhouse [R-WA] | Rep. James Moylan [R-GU] |
Rep. Byron Donalds [R-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-12 | House | Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute by the Yeas and Nays: 22 - 13. |
2024-03-12 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held |
2024-03-12 | House | Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources Discharged |
2024-01-31 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held |
2024-01-30 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources. |
2023-12-19 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2023-12-19 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/house-bill/6862/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/hr6862/BILLS-118hr6862ih.pdf |