US HB6856 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-14 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 461.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-14 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 461.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To reduce the number of firearms at Transportation Security Administration passenger screening checkpoints by directing the Administrator to carry out a range of activities to inform the public about restrictions regarding the carrying of firearms in sterile areas of airports and to strengthen enforcement of such restrictions and for other purposes.
Title
Securing Air Travel Act
Sponsors
Rep. Bonnie Coleman [D-NJ] | Rep. Bennie Thompson [D-MS] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-14 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 461. |
2022-12-14 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 117-641. |
2022-03-02 | House | Subcommittee on Transportation and Maritime Security Discharged. |
2022-03-02 | House | Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute by the Yeas and Nays: 21 - 12. |
2022-03-02 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2022-03-01 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Transportation and Maritime Security. |
2022-02-28 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Homeland Security. |
2022-02-28 | House | Introduced in House |