US HB6846 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 15 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-15 - Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
Pending: House Foreign Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 15 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-15 - Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
Pending: House Foreign Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To require the United States Government to assist in the establishment of national security councils in specified countries.
Title
Connecting Oceania’s Nations with Vanguard Exercises and National Empowerment Act of 2023 CONVENE Act of 2023
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Waltz [R-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-15 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
2023-12-15 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB2670 (Related) 2023-12-22 - Became Public Law No: 118-31.
SB2226 (Related) 2023-07-27 - Senate ordered measure printed as passed.
SB3547 (Same As) 2023-12-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
SB2226 (Related) 2023-07-27 - Senate ordered measure printed as passed.
SB3547 (Same As) 2023-12-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/house-bill/6846/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/hr6846/BILLS-118hr6846ih.pdf |