US HB6785 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 37-1)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-17 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-17 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To assist in the conservation of the North Atlantic right whale by supporting and providing financial resources for North Atlantic right whale conservation programs and projects of persons with expertise required for the conservation of North Atlantic right whales, and for other purposes.
Title
Right Whale Coexistence Act of 2022
Sponsors
Rep. Seth Moulton [D-MA] | Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA] | Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH] | Rep. Joseph Neguse [D-CO] |
Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL] | Rep. Sean Casten [D-IL] | Rep. Ed Case [D-HI] | Rep. Lucy McBath [D-GA] |
Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA] | Rep. Jerry McNerney [D-CA] | Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA] | Rep. Pete Aguilar [D-CA] |
Rep. Andy Levin [D-MI] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Katie Porter [D-CA] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] |
Rep. Diana DeGette [D-CO] | Rep. Julia Brownley [D-CA] | Rep. Rashida Tlaib [D-MI] | Rep. Stephanie Murphy [D-FL] |
Rep. Melanie Stansbury [D-NM] | Rep. Madeleine Dean [D-PA] | Rep. Jamaal Bowman [D-NY] | Rep. Mark Pocan [D-WI] |
Rep. Jerrold Nadler [D-NY] | Rep. Lori Trahan [D-MA] | Rep. Thomas Suozzi [D-NY] | Rep. Nanette Barragan [D-CA] |
Rep. William Keating [D-MA] | Rep. Deborah Ross [D-NC] | Rep. Stephen Lynch [D-MA] | Rep. Doris Matsui [D-CA] |
Rep. Marie Newman [D-IL] | Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR] | Rep. David Trone [D-MD] | Rep. Gregory Meeks [D-NY] |
Rep. Tony Cardenas [D-CA] | Rep. James McGovern [D-MA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-17 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2022-03-02 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife. |
2022-02-18 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2022-02-18 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB3664 (Same As) 2022-12-12 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 628.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/6785/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr6785/BILLS-117hr6785ih.pdf |