US SB3664 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-12 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 628.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-12 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 628.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to assist in the conservation of the North Atlantic right whale by supporting and providing financial resources for North Atlantic right whale conservation programs and projects of persons with expertise required for the conservation of North Atlantic right whales, and for other purposes.
Title
Right Whale Coexistence Act of 2022
Sponsors
Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ] | Sen. Thomas Carper [D-DE] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D-RI] |
Sen. Alex Padilla [D-CA] | Sen. Chris Van Hollen [D-MD] | Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 628. |
2022-12-12 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Cantwell with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report. |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
Same As/Similar To
HB4487 (Related) 2021-08-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife.
HB6785 (Same As) 2022-03-17 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
HB6785 (Same As) 2022-03-17 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.