US HB6758 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-31 - Became Public Law No: 115-273.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-31 - Became Public Law No: 115-273.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
SUCCESS Act Study of Underrepresented Classes Chasing Engineering and Science Success Act of 2018 (Sec. 3) This bill directs the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office (USPTO) to study and report to Congress on the number of patents applied for and obtained: (1) by women, minorities, and veterans; and (2) by small businesses owned by women, minorities, and veterans. The USPTO must provide legislative recommendations to increase the number of women, minorities, and veterans who participate in entrepreneurship activities and apply for patents. (Sec. 4) Additionally, the bill amends the Leahy-Smith America Invents Act to extend for eight years the authority of the USPTO to set and adjust patent fees.
Title
SUCCESS Act Study of Underrepresented Classes Chasing Engineering and Science Success Act of 2018
Sponsors
Rep. Steve Chabot [R-OH] | Rep. Henry Johnson [D-GA] | Rep. Bob Goodlatte [R-VA] | Rep. Jerrold Nadler [D-NY] |
Rep. Barbara Comstock [R-VA] | Rep. Hakeem Jeffries [D-NY] | Rep. Nydia Velazquez [D-NY] | Rep. Ann Wagner [R-MO] |
Rep. Alma Adams [D-NC] | Rep. Karen Handel [R-GA] | Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-10-31 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 115-273. |
2018-10-31 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2018-10-24 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2018-10-12 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2018-10-11 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6876) |
2018-09-26 | Senate | Received in the Senate, read twice. |
2018-09-25 | House | The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection. |
2018-09-25 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-09-25 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8815) |
2018-09-25 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 6758. |
2018-09-25 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8815-8817) |
2018-09-25 | House | Mr. Chabot moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2018-09-25 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 754. |
2018-09-25 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 115-966. |
2018-09-13 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2018-09-13 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2018-09-10 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2018-09-10 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB6390 (Related) 2018-08-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Courts, Intellectual Property, and the Internet.
SB3416 (Related) 2018-09-06 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB3483 (Related) 2018-09-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB3416 (Related) 2018-09-06 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB3483 (Related) 2018-09-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.