US HB6755 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on September 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-09-13 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-09-13 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Judiciary ROOM Act of 2018 Judiciary Reforms, Organization and Operational Modernization Act of 2018
Title
Judiciary ROOM Act of 2018 Judiciary Reforms, Organization and Operational Modernization Act of 2018
Sponsors
Rep. Darrell Issa [R-CA] | Rep. Bob Goodlatte [R-VA] | Rep. George Holding [R-NC] | Rep. Lamar Smith [R-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-13 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2018-09-13 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2018-09-10 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2018-09-10 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2018-09-10 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB3899 (Related) 2017-10-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Courts, Intellectual Property, and the Internet.
HB6327 (Related) 2018-08-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Courts, Intellectual Property, and the Internet.
HB6761 (Related) 2018-09-10 - Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
SB1416 (Related) 2017-06-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HB6327 (Related) 2018-08-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Courts, Intellectual Property, and the Internet.
HB6761 (Related) 2018-09-10 - Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
SB1416 (Related) 2017-06-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/6755/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr6755/BILLS-115hr6755ih.pdf |