US HB6738 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Introduced on May 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-21 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-21 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To reauthorize and amend the Coral Reef Conservation Act of 2000, and for other purposes.
Title
Coral Reef Conservation Reauthorization Act of 2020
Sponsors
Rep. Ed Case [D-HI] | Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL] | Rep. Tulsi Gabbard [D-HI] | Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA] |
Rep. Gregorio Sablan [D-MP] | Rep. Amata Radewagen [R-AS] | Rep. Ted Yoho [R-FL] | Rep. Kathy Castor [D-FL] |
Rep. Charlie Crist [D-FL] | Rep. Bill Posey [R-FL] | Rep. Michael San Nicolas [D-GU] | Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife. |
2020-05-08 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-05-08 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-05-08 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB3384 (Related) 2019-07-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife.
SB1922 (Similar To) 2019-06-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
SB1922 (Similar To) 2019-06-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Subjects
Air quality
Animal and plant health
Aquatic ecology
Biological and life sciences
Climate change and greenhouse gases
Congressional oversight
Department of Commerce
Department of the Interior
Economic performance and conditions
Emergency planning and evacuation
Employment and training programs
Endangered and threatened species
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Environmental education
Environmental health
Environmental protection
Executive agency funding and structure
Floods and storm protection
Genetics
Geography and mapping
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Hunting and fishing
Intergovernmental relations
Land use and conservation
Licensing and registrations
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Marine and inland water transportation
Marine pollution
Monuments and memorials
Navigation, waterways, harbors
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Pest management
Public-private cooperation
Research administration and funding
Research and development
Rural conditions and development
Travel and tourism
User charges and fees
Water quality
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
Animal and plant health
Aquatic ecology
Biological and life sciences
Climate change and greenhouse gases
Congressional oversight
Department of Commerce
Department of the Interior
Economic performance and conditions
Emergency planning and evacuation
Employment and training programs
Endangered and threatened species
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Environmental education
Environmental health
Environmental protection
Executive agency funding and structure
Floods and storm protection
Genetics
Geography and mapping
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Hunting and fishing
Intergovernmental relations
Land use and conservation
Licensing and registrations
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Marine and inland water transportation
Marine pollution
Monuments and memorials
Navigation, waterways, harbors
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Pest management
Public-private cooperation
Research administration and funding
Research and development
Rural conditions and development
Travel and tourism
User charges and fees
Water quality
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/6738/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr6738/BILLS-116hr6738ih.pdf |