US HB6707 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-07 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 432.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-07 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 432.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Maine Indian Claims Settlement Act of 1980 to advance equality for Wabanaki nations, and for other purposes.
Title
Advancing Equality for Wabanaki Nations Act
Sponsors
Rep. Jared Golden [D-ME] | Rep. Chellie Pingree [D-ME] | Rep. Sharice Davids [D-KS] | Rep. Jesus Garcia [D-IL] |
Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL] | Rep. Jim Costa [D-CA] | Rep. Joseph Neguse [D-CO] | Rep. Ed Case [D-HI] |
Rep. Lori Trahan [D-MA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-07 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 432. |
2022-12-07 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 117-599. |
2022-06-15 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 24 - 17. |
2022-06-15 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2022-06-15 | House | Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States Discharged. |
2022-03-31 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2022-02-18 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States. |
2022-02-11 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2022-02-11 | House | Introduced in House |