US HB6701 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-05 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Pending: House Energy And Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-05 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Pending: House Energy And Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the National Institutes of Health (NIH), in consultation with the Centers for Disease Control and Prevention, to conduct a longitudinal study on the health impacts of COVID-19 (i.e., coronavirus disease 2019). The NIH must provide public summaries of findings on specified timelines.
Title
Ensuring Understanding of COVID–19 to Protect Public Health Act
Sponsors
Rep. Anna Eshoo [D-CA] | Rep. Michael Burgess [R-TX] | Rep. Diana DeGette [D-CO] | Rep. Brett Guthrie [R-KY] |
Rep. David Trone [D-MD] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-05 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2020-05-05 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB6800 (Related) 2020-07-23 - Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Hearings held.
SB3595 (Same As) 2020-05-04 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HR967 (Similar To) 2020-05-15 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB3595 (Same As) 2020-05-04 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HR967 (Similar To) 2020-05-15 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Child health
Drug therapy
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Health
Immunology and vaccination
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Medical research
Mental health
Public-private cooperation
Research administration and funding
Child health
Drug therapy
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Health
Immunology and vaccination
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Medical research
Mental health
Public-private cooperation
Research administration and funding
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/6701/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr6701/BILLS-116hr6701ih.pdf |