US SB3595 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on May 4 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-05-04 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Ensuring Understanding of COVID-19 to Protect Public Health Act This bill requires the National Institutes of Health (NIH), in consultation with the Centers for Disease Control and Prevention, to conduct a longitudinal study on the health impacts of COVID-19 (i.e., coronavirus disease 2019). The NIH must provide public summaries of findings on specified timelines.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Ensuring Understanding of COVID-19 to Protect Public Health Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-04SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.

Same As/Similar To

HB6800 (Related) 2020-06-01 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 455.
HB6701 (Same As) 2020-05-05 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
HR967 (Similar To) 2020-05-15 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback