US HB667 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-11-16 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 404.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-11-16 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 404.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To authorize the Secretary of Health and Human Services, acting through the Director of the Indian Health Service, to acquire private land to facilitate access to the Desert Sage Youth Wellness Center in Hemet, California, and for other purposes.
Title
Desert Sage Youth Wellness Center Access Improvement Act
Sponsors
Rep. Raul Ruiz [D-CA] | Rep. Nanette Barragan [D-CA] | Rep. Tony Cardenas [D-CA] | Rep. Pete Aguilar [D-CA] |
Rep. Ken Calvert [R-CA] | Rep. Mike Thompson [D-CA] | Rep. Darrell Issa [R-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-16 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 404. |
2022-11-16 | House | Committee on Energy and Commerce discharged. |
2022-11-16 | House | Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 117-563, Part I. |
2021-11-17 | House | Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States Discharged. |
2021-11-17 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2021-11-17 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2021-11-17 | House | Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands Discharged. |
2021-02-23 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States. |
2021-02-23 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands. |
2021-02-02 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2021-02-01 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2021-02-01 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB144 (Same As) 2022-07-29 - Became Public Law No: 117-161.
HB3755 (Related) 2022-02-28 - Cloture on the motion to proceed to the measure not invoked in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 46 - 48. Record Vote Number: 65. (CR S826)
HR667 (Similar To) 2021-09-21 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB3755 (Related) 2022-02-28 - Cloture on the motion to proceed to the measure not invoked in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 46 - 48. Record Vote Number: 65. (CR S826)
HR667 (Similar To) 2021-09-21 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.