US HB6651 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-27 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-27 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To establish an Alaska Salmon Research Task Force.
Title
Alaska Salmon Research Task Force Act
Sponsors
Rep. Don Young [R-AK] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-27 | Senate | Received in the Senate. |
2022-04-26 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2022-04-26 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4485) |
2022-04-26 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 6651. |
2022-04-26 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4485-4486) |
2022-04-26 | House | Mr. Grijalva moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2022-04-25 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 222. |
2022-04-25 | House | Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 117-300. |
2022-04-06 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2022-04-06 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2022-04-06 | House | Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States Discharged. |
2022-04-06 | House | Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife Discharged. |
2022-03-17 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2022-02-11 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States. |
2022-02-11 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife. |
2022-02-08 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2022-02-08 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB3429 (Related) 2022-12-15 - Held at the desk.