US HB6645 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To promote the production of hemp and hemp products, and for other purposes.
Title
Hemp Advancement Act of 2022
Sponsors
Rep. Chellie Pingree [D-ME] | Rep. Mark Pocan [D-WI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-01 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security. |
2022-02-18 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Biotechnology, Horticulture, and Research. |
2022-02-09 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2022-02-08 | House | Referred to the Committee on Agriculture, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2022-02-08 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB5175 (Related) 2022-12-01 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/6645/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr6645/BILLS-117hr6645ih.pdf |