US HB6610 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-20 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-20 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To provide for the modernization of the passport issuance process, and for other purposes.
Title
Passport System Reform and Backlog Prevention Act
Sponsors
Rep. Darrell Issa [R-CA] | Rep. Maria Salazar [R-FL] | Rep. Jim Costa [D-CA] | Rep. Nikema Williams [D-GA] |
Rep. Michael Lawler [R-NY] | Rep. Warren Davidson [R-OH] | Rep. Jenniffer Gonzalez-Colon [R-PR] | Rep. Bradley Schneider [D-IL] |
Rep. Mike Collins [R-GA] | Rep. Katie Porter [D-CA] | Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL] | Rep. Dina Titus [D-NV] |
Rep. Alma Adams [D-NC] | Rep. Derrick Van Orden [R-WI] | Rep. Brandon Williams [R-NY] | Rep. Richard Hudson [R-NC] |
Rep. Jesus Garcia [D-IL] | Rep. Pramila Jayapal [D-WA] | Rep. Roger Williams [R-TX] | Rep. Grace Meng [D-NY] |
Rep. Hillary Scholten [D-MI] | Rep. Lloyd Smucker [R-PA] | Rep. Clay Higgins [R-LA] | Rep. Josh Gottheimer [D-NJ] |
Rep. Lori Chavez-DeRemer [R-OR] | Rep. Juan Ciscomani [R-AZ] | Rep. Colin Allred [D-TX] | Rep. Sydney Kamlager-Dove [D-CA] |
Rep. Thomas Kean [R-NJ] | Rep. Michael Turner [R-OH] | Rep. Joaquin Castro [D-TX] | Rep. Chrissy Houlahan [D-PA] |
Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Sen. Lisa Rochester [D-DE] | Rep. Nick LaLota [R-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-20 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. |
2024-03-19 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2024-03-19 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H1198-1200) |
2024-03-19 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 6610. |
2024-03-19 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1198-1201) |
2024-03-19 | House | Mrs. Wagner moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2023-12-13 | House | Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 46 - 0. |
2023-12-13 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held |
2023-12-06 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
2023-12-06 | House | Introduced in House |