US HB6602 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Enrolled on January 2 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-02 - Presented to President.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on January 2 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-02 - Presented to President.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To reauthorize the New Jersey Coastal Heritage Trail Route, and for other purposes.
Title
To reauthorize the New Jersey Coastal Heritage Trail Route, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Frank LoBiondo [R-NJ] | Rep. Albio Sires [D-NJ] | Rep. Bill Pascrell [D-NJ] | Rep. Christopher Smith [R-NJ] |
Rep. Bonnie Coleman [D-NJ] | Rep. Frank Pallone [D-NJ] | Rep. Donald Norcross [D-NJ] | Rep. Josh Gottheimer [D-NJ] |
Rep. Rodney Frelinghuysen [R-NJ] | Rep. Donald Payne [D-NJ] | Rep. Leonard Lance [R-NJ] |
Roll Calls
2018-12-20 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill RC# 473 (Y: 382 N: 9 NV: 41 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-02 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2018-12-22 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2018-12-22 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S8025) |
2018-12-21 | Senate | Received in the Senate, read twice. |
2018-12-20 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-12-20 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by recorded vote (2/3 required): 382 - 9 (Roll no. 473). |
2018-12-20 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H10500) |
2018-12-19 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the chair put the question on the motion to suspend the rules. Mr. McClintock objected to the vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed. The point of no quorum was considered as withdrawn. |
2018-12-19 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 6602. |
2018-12-19 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H10302-10303; text: CR H10302) |
2018-12-19 | House | Mr. McClintock moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2018-12-03 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 827. |
2018-12-03 | House | Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-1061. |
2018-11-15 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2018-11-15 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2018-11-15 | House | Subcommittee on Federal Lands Discharged. |
2018-08-16 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands. |
2018-07-26 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2018-07-26 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB3291 (Same As) 2018-12-12 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held.
Subjects
Historic sites and heritage areas
Historical and cultural resources
Land use and conservation
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
New Jersey
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
Roads and highways
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
Historical and cultural resources
Land use and conservation
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
New Jersey
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
Roads and highways
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection