US HB66 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend title XXI of the Social Security Act to permanently extend the Children's Health Insurance Program, and for other purposes.
Title
CARING for Kids Act Comprehensive Access to Robust Insurance Now Guaranteed for Kids Act
Sponsors
Rep. Vern Buchanan [R-FL] | Rep. Lucy McBath [D-GA] | Rep. Nikema Williams [D-GA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-02 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2021-01-04 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2021-01-04 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB1791 (Related) 2021-03-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB5376 (Related) 2022-08-16 - Became Public Law No: 117-169.
SB4486 (Related) 2022-06-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB8862 (Related) 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
HB5376 (Related) 2022-08-16 - Became Public Law No: 117-169.
SB4486 (Related) 2022-06-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB8862 (Related) 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/66/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr66/BILLS-117hr66ih.pdf |