US HB6574 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-2)
Status: Introduced on April 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-21 - Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services.
Pending: House Armed Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-21 - Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services.
Pending: House Armed Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Department of Defense (DOD) to create a uniform online portal for congressional nominations to military service academies. DOD must (1) establish standard classifications that cadets, midshipmen, and academy applicants may use to self-identify gender, race, ethnicity, and other demographic information; and (2) annually report such demographics.
Title
PANORAMA Act of 2020 Public Accountability on Nominations Offered that Result in Admissions to Military Academies Act of 2020
Sponsors
Rep. Anthony Brown [D-MD] | Rep. Jackie Speier [D-CA] | Rep. Chrissy Houlahan [D-PA] | Rep. Veronica Escobar [D-TX] |
Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA] | Rep. Gil Cisneros [D-CA] | Rep. Filemon Vela [D-TX] | Rep. Debra Haaland [D-NM] |
Rep. Salud Carbajal [D-CA] | Rep. Eric Swalwell [D-CA] | Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX] | Rep. Denny Heck [D-WA] |
Rep. Michael San Nicolas [D-GU] | Rep. TJ Cox [D-CA] | Rep. Andre Carson [D-IN] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] |
Rep. Don Bacon [R-NE] | Rep. Stephanie Murphy [D-FL] | Rep. Michael Turner [R-OH] | Rep. C.A. Ruppersberger [D-MD] |
Rep. Jim Costa [D-CA] | Rep. Josh Harder [D-CA] | Rep. Pete Aguilar [D-CA] | Rep. Cheri Bustos [D-IL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-21 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services. |
2020-04-21 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB3783 (Same As) 2020-05-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
HB6395 (Related) 2021-01-02 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
HR1271 (Related) 2020-12-21 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB6395 (Related) 2021-01-02 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
HR1271 (Related) 2020-12-21 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Congressional oversight
Government information and archives
Internet and video services
Members of Congress
Military education and training
Military personnel and dependents
Personnel records
Congressional oversight
Government information and archives
Internet and video services
Members of Congress
Military education and training
Military personnel and dependents
Personnel records
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/6574/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr6574/BILLS-116hr6574ih.pdf |