US HB6547 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on December 1 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-09-19 - Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute by the Yeas and Nays: 24 - 11.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 1 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-09-19 - Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute by the Yeas and Nays: 24 - 11.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To prohibit the Secretary of the Interior from implementing the Draft Resource Management Plan and Draft Supplemental Environmental Impact Statement for the Colorado River Valley Field Office and Grand Junction Field Office Resource Management Plans.
Title
Colorado Energy Prosperity Act
Sponsors
Rep. Lauren Boebert [R-CO] | Rep. Doug Lamborn [R-CO] | Rep. Andrew Ogles [R-TN] | Rep. Troy Nehls [R-TX] |
Rep. Dan Newhouse [R-WA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-09-19 | House | Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute by the Yeas and Nays: 24 - 11. |
2024-09-19 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held |
2024-09-19 | House | Subcommittee on Federal Lands Discharged |
2024-03-20 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held |
2024-03-18 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands. |
2023-12-01 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2023-12-01 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/house-bill/6547/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/hr6547/BILLS-118hr6547ih.pdf |