US HB6528 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Oversight and Investigations.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Oversight and Investigations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Oversight and Investigations.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Oversight and Investigations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Excludes certain appointed positions within the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) from current executive schedule salary caps. Specifically, the current salary caps do not apply for (1) appointed directors of VA medical centers, (2) appointed directors of Veterans Integrated Service Networks, and (3) appointees of the Office of the Under Secretary for Health. The bill authorizes the VA to waive the salary limitations on such employees who were appointed during the period beginning on November 1, 2010, and ending on the day before the enactment of this bill.
Title
VA RAISES Act VA Recruitment Assistance to Improve Senior Executive Service Act
Sponsors
Rep. Gil Cisneros [D-CA] | Sen. Roger Marshall [R-KS] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-13 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Oversight and Investigations. |
2020-04-17 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2020-04-17 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB3084 (Related) 2020-07-02 - Became Public Law No: 116-146. (TXT | PDF)
HB6800 (Related) 2020-07-23 - Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Hearings held.
HR967 (Similar To) 2020-05-15 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB6800 (Related) 2020-07-23 - Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Hearings held.
HR967 (Similar To) 2020-05-15 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Department of Veterans Affairs
Federal officials
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Veterans' medical care
Department of Veterans Affairs
Federal officials
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Veterans' medical care
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/6528/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr6528/BILLS-116hr6528ih.pdf |