US HB6438 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on September 5 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-09-05 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 5 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-09-05 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
DHS Countering Unmanned Aircraft Systems Coordinator Act (Sec. 2) This bill amends the Homeland Security Act of 2002 to direct the Department of Homeland Security (DHS) to designate a DHS official as the Countering Unmanned Aircraft Systems (UAS) Coordinator to coordinate with relevant DHS offices and components on the development of policies and plans to counter threats associated with UAS, including: countering UAS that may be used in a terrorist attack; promoting research and development of counter UAS technologies; ensuring the dissemination of information and guidance related to countering such threats; and serving as the DHS point of contact for federal, state, local, and tribal law enforcement entities and the private sector regarding DHS activities to counter UAS. The coordinator shall: (1) ensure that activities for identifying, assessing, or defeating a UAS are carried out in accordance with applicable federal laws; and (2) serve as the principal DHS official for disseminating information regarding counter-UAS technology to the private sector.
Title
DHS Countering Unmanned Aircraft Systems Coordinator Act
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Perry [R-PA] | Rep. Michael McCaul [R-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-05 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
2018-09-04 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-09-04 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7810) |
2018-09-04 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 6438. |
2018-09-04 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR S7810-7811) |
2018-09-04 | House | Mr. Perry moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2018-08-28 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 704. |
2018-08-28 | House | Reported by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 115-908. |
2018-07-24 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2018-07-24 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2018-07-19 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Homeland Security. |
2018-07-19 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Aviation and airports
Department of Homeland Security
Emergency management
Executive agency funding and structure
Federal officials
Federal-Indian relations
Intergovernmental relations
Public-private cooperation
Research and development
State and local government operations
Terrorism
Transportation safety and security
Department of Homeland Security
Emergency management
Executive agency funding and structure
Federal officials
Federal-Indian relations
Intergovernmental relations
Public-private cooperation
Research and development
State and local government operations
Terrorism
Transportation safety and security