US HB6425 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on September 14 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-09-21 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Fisheries, Wildlife, Oceans, and Insular Affairs.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Fisheries, Wildlife, Oceans, and Insular Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 14 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-09-21 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Fisheries, Wildlife, Oceans, and Insular Affairs.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Fisheries, Wildlife, Oceans, and Insular Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Replaces the map included in the set of maps entitled "Coastal Barrier Resources System" (referred to in specified provisions of the Coastal Barrier Resources Act and relating to Saddlebunch Keys Unit FL-57 in the state of Florida) with another map relating to the same unit entitled "John H. Chafee Coastal Barrier Resources System Corrected Saddlebunch Keys Unit FL-57."
Title
To revise the boundaries of the John H. Chafee Coastal Barrier System Saddlebunch Keys Unit FL-57.
Sponsors
Rep. Ileana Ros-Lehtinen [R-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-21 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Fisheries, Wildlife, Oceans, and Insular Affairs. |
2012-09-14 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2154 (Related) 2012-07-09 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 420.
HB2155 (Related) 2011-06-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Fisheries, Wildlife, Oceans, and Insular Affairs.
HB2156 (Related) 2011-06-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Fisheries, Wildlife, Oceans, and Insular Affairs.
HB4311 (Related) 2012-04-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Fisheries, Wildlife, Oceans, and Insular Affairs.
HB6354 (Related) 2012-08-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Fisheries, Wildlife, Oceans, and Insular Affairs.
HB2155 (Related) 2011-06-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Fisheries, Wildlife, Oceans, and Insular Affairs.
HB2156 (Related) 2011-06-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Fisheries, Wildlife, Oceans, and Insular Affairs.
HB4311 (Related) 2012-04-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Fisheries, Wildlife, Oceans, and Insular Affairs.
HB6354 (Related) 2012-08-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Fisheries, Wildlife, Oceans, and Insular Affairs.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/112th-congress/house-bill/6425/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/112/bills/hr6425/BILLS-112hr6425ih.pdf |