US HB6354 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on August 2 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-08-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Fisheries, Wildlife, Oceans, and Insular Affairs.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Fisheries, Wildlife, Oceans, and Insular Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on August 2 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-08-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Fisheries, Wildlife, Oceans, and Insular Affairs.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Fisheries, Wildlife, Oceans, and Insular Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Replaces the map included in the set of maps entitled "Coastal Barrier Resources System" (referred to in specified provisions of the Coastal Barrier Resources Act and relating to Unit P-31P in the state of Florida) with another map relating to the same unit entitled "John H. Chafee Coastal Barrier Resources System Corrected Unit P-31P."
Title
To correct the boundaries of the John H. Chafee Coastal Barrier Resources System Unit P-31P.
Sponsors
Rep. Steve Southerland [R-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-16 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Fisheries, Wildlife, Oceans, and Insular Affairs. |
2012-08-02 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2154 (Related) 2012-07-09 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 420.
HB2155 (Related) 2011-06-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Fisheries, Wildlife, Oceans, and Insular Affairs.
HB2156 (Related) 2011-06-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Fisheries, Wildlife, Oceans, and Insular Affairs.
HB4311 (Related) 2012-04-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Fisheries, Wildlife, Oceans, and Insular Affairs.
HB6425 (Related) 2012-09-21 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Fisheries, Wildlife, Oceans, and Insular Affairs.
HB2155 (Related) 2011-06-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Fisheries, Wildlife, Oceans, and Insular Affairs.
HB2156 (Related) 2011-06-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Fisheries, Wildlife, Oceans, and Insular Affairs.
HB4311 (Related) 2012-04-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Fisheries, Wildlife, Oceans, and Insular Affairs.
HB6425 (Related) 2012-09-21 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Fisheries, Wildlife, Oceans, and Insular Affairs.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/112th-congress/house-bill/6354/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/112/bills/hr6354/BILLS-112hr6354ih.pdf |