US HB6287 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on September 17 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-09-27 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 587.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

9/11 Memorial Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

9/11 Memorial Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-27SenateRead the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 587.
2018-09-26SenateRead the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time.
2018-09-17SenateReceived in the Senate.
2018-09-12HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2018-09-12HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8136-8137)
2018-09-12HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 6287.
2018-09-12HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8136-8139)
2018-09-12HouseMr. Gianforte moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
2018-09-10HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 722.
2018-09-10HouseReported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-930.
2018-09-05HouseOrdered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
2018-09-05HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2018-06-28HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
2018-06-28HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB3167 (Same As) 2018-06-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback