US HB6282 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-13 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Pending: House Energy And Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-13 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Pending: House Energy And Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Department of Health and Human Services to enter into an agreement with the National Academies of Sciences, Engineering, and Medicine to report on the security of the U.S. medical product supply chain (i.e., supply of drugs and devices). Among other things, the report shall assess the dependence of the United States, including the private sector, states, and federal government, on critical drugs and devices sourced or manufactured outside of the United States; and provide recommendations to address supply vulnerabilities or potential disruptions.
Title
Commission on America’s Medical Security Act
Sponsors
Rep. Raul Ruiz [D-CA] | Rep. Lauren Underwood [D-IL] | Rep. David Roe [R-TN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-13 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2020-03-13 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB748 (Related) 2020-07-23 - Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Hearings held.
SB3548 (Related) 2020-06-03 - Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Hearings held.
SB3478 (Related) 2020-03-12 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (text: CR S1743)
SB3548 (Related) 2020-06-03 - Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Hearings held.
SB3478 (Related) 2020-03-12 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (text: CR S1743)
Subjects
Chemical and biological weapons
Drug safety, medical device, and laboratory regulation
Economic performance and conditions
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Emergency planning and evacuation
Government studies and investigations
Health
Health care coverage and access
Health technology, devices, supplies
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Manufacturing
Terrorism
Drug safety, medical device, and laboratory regulation
Economic performance and conditions
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Emergency planning and evacuation
Government studies and investigations
Health
Health care coverage and access
Health technology, devices, supplies
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Manufacturing
Terrorism
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/6282/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr6282/BILLS-116hr6282ih.pdf |