US HB6138 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on July 25 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-07-25 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 25 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-07-25 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
ASC Payment Transparency Act of 2018 Ambulatory Surgical Center Payment Transparency Act of 2018 (Sec. 2) This bill requires the expert outside advisory panel that reviews the Medicare prospective payment system for hospital outpatient department services to include at least one ambulatory surgical center representative. (Sec. 3) The bill also requires the Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services to specify the criteria used to exclude certain procedures from the list of covered surgical procedures that may be performed in an ambulatory surgical center under Medicare.
Title
ASC Payment Transparency Act of 2018 Ambulatory Surgical Center Payment Transparency Act of 2018
Sponsors
Rep. Devin Nunes [R-CA] | Rep. John Larson [D-CT] | Rep. Louie Gohmert [R-TX] | Rep. Leonard Lance [R-NJ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-25 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
2018-07-24 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-07-24 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7116-7117) |
2018-07-24 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 6138. |
2018-07-24 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7116-7118) |
2018-07-24 | House | Mr. Nunes moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2018-07-17 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 643. |
2018-07-17 | House | Committee on Energy and Commerce discharged. |
2018-07-17 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 115-831, Part I. |
2018-06-27 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2018-06-21 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2018-06-21 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2018-06-19 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2018-06-19 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2018-06-19 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB1838 (Related) 2017-04-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SB1001 (Related) 2017-05-02 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB1001 (Related) 2017-05-02 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.