US HB612 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-12-20 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 158.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Expands a program that compensates individuals who were exposed to radiation from atmospheric nuclear testing and subsequently developed specified cancers. Under current law, the program compensates, among others, individuals who were present in a designated geographic area during a period of nuclear testing. The bill expands that area to include all parts of Clark County, Nevada, and Mohave County, Arizona. Current law restricts eligibility to certain parts of those counties. The Department of Justice must report on efforts to inform individuals newly eligible for compensation about the program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Downwinders Parity Act of 2021

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-20HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 158.
2021-12-20HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 117-220.
2021-11-17HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 25 - 13.
2021-11-17HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2021-11-17HouseSubcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties Discharged.
2021-03-22HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
2021-01-28HouseReferred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
2021-01-28HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB538 (Related) 2021-03-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
SB2012 (Same As) 2021-06-10 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback