US HB6063 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on November 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-07 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 430.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-07 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 430.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To provide for the equitable settlement of certain Indian land disputes regarding land in Illinois, and for other purposes.
Title
To provide for the equitable settlement of certain Indian land disputes regarding land in Illinois, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Betty McCollum [D-MN] | Sen. Markwayne Mullin [R-OK] | Rep. Don Young [R-AK] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-07 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 430. |
2022-12-07 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 117-597. |
2022-06-15 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2022-06-15 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2022-06-15 | House | Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States Discharged. |
2022-04-27 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2021-12-08 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States. |
2021-11-19 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2021-11-19 | House | Introduced in House |