US HB603 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 203-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-28 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
Pending: House Education and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-28 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
Pending: House Education and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To provide for increases in the Federal minimum wage, and for other purposes.
Title
Raise the Wage Act of 2021
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-28 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor. |
2021-01-28 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB53 (Same As) 2021-01-26 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HB325 (Related) 2021-01-15 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
HB1319 (Related) 2021-03-11 - Became Public Law No: 117-2.
HB325 (Related) 2021-01-15 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
HB1319 (Related) 2021-03-11 - Became Public Law No: 117-2.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/603/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr603/BILLS-117hr603ih.pdf |