US SB53 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 37-1)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-26 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-26 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to provide for increases in the Federal minimum wage, and for other purposes.
Title
Raise the Wage Act of 2021
Sponsors
Sen. Bernard Sanders [I-VT] | Sen. Patty Murray [D-WA] | Sen. Charles Schumer [D-NY] | Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI] |
Sen. Michael Bennet [D-CO] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ] | Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH] |
Sen. Maria Cantwell [D-WA] | Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] | Sen. Robert Casey [D-PA] | Sen. Tammy Duckworth [D-IL] |
Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] | Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] | Sen. Kirsten Gillibrand [D-NY] | Sen. Martin Heinrich [D-NM] |
Sen. Mazie Hirono [D-HI] | Sen. Tim Kaine [D-VA] | Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] | Sen. Patrick Leahy [D-VT] |
Sen. Ben Lujan [D-NM] | Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] | Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR] | Sen. Christopher Murphy [D-CT] |
Sen. Alex Padilla [D-CA] | Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] | Sen. Jon Ossoff [D-GA] | Sen. Jack Reed [D-RI] |
Sen. Jacky Rosen [D-NV] | Sen. Brian Schatz [D-HI] | Sen. Tina Smith [D-MN] | Sen. Debbie Stabenow [D-MI] |
Sen. Chris Van Hollen [D-MD] | Sen. Mark Warner [D-VA] | Sen. Raphael Warnock [D-GA] | Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA] |
Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D-RI] | Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-26 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. |
Same As/Similar To
HB603 (Same As) 2021-01-28 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
HB325 (Related) 2021-01-15 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
HB1319 (Related) 2021-03-11 - Became Public Law No: 117-2.
HB325 (Related) 2021-01-15 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
HB1319 (Related) 2021-03-11 - Became Public Law No: 117-2.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/senate-bill/53/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/s53/BILLS-117s53is.pdf |