US HB6 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 232-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-10 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 112.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-10 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 112.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Cancels and prohibits removal proceedings against certain aliens and provides such aliens with a path toward permanent resident status. The Department of Homeland Security (DHS) or the Department of Justice (DOJ) shall cancel removal proceedings against certain aliens who entered the United States as minors and grant such aliens conditional permanent residence status for 10 years. The bill imposes various qualification requirements, such as the alien being continuously physically present in the United States and being enrolled in or having completed certain educational programs. DHS shall establish streamlined procedures to apply for conditional permanent residence for aliens who received Deferred Action for Childhood Arrivals (DACA) status and were not disqualified for renewal. DHS shall remove the conditional permanent resident status granted to such aliens, if the alien applies and meets certain requirements, such as completing certain programs at an educational institution or serving at least two years in the Uniformed Services and being discharged honorably. DHS or DOJ shall cancel removal proceedings against certain aliens who qualified for temporary protected status or deferred enforced departure status on certain past dates (both statuses temporarily protect covered aliens from removal). For such aliens who apply and pass the required background checks, DHS shall grant permanent residence status. DHS may not use information from applications to adjust status under this bill for immigration enforcement purposes. DHS shall establish a grant program for nonprofit organizations that assist individuals with certain immigration-related issues.
Title
American Dream and Promise Act of 2019
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-04 - House - On passage RC# 240 (Y: 237 N: 187 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - House - On motion to recommit with instructions RC# 239 (Y: 202 N: 221 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-06-04 - House - On motion to recommit with instructions RC# 239 (Y: 202 N: 221 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-10 | Senate | Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 112. |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time. |
2019-06-04 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-06-04 | House | On passage Passed by recorded vote: 237 - 187 (Roll no. 240). (text: CR H4265-4272) |
2019-06-04 | House | On motion to recommit with instructions Failed by recorded vote: 202 - 221 (Roll no. 239). |
2019-06-04 | House | The previous question on the motion to recommit with instructions was ordered without objection. |
2019-06-04 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Cline motion to recommit with instructions. The instructions contained in the motion seek to require the bill to be reported back to the House with an amendment notwithstanding sections 111(e), 129, 211(c)(3), and 229 of this Act, an alien whose application would be denied based on criminal, national security, gang, or public safety grounds shall be referred by the Secretary of Homeland Security for determination of whether the alien should be placed in removal proceedings under section 240 of the Immigration and Nationality Act. |
2019-06-04 | House | Mr. Cline moved to recommit with instructions to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text: CR H4292) |
2019-06-04 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H4292, H4294-4295) |
2019-06-04 | House | POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - Pursuant to clause 1(c) of Rule 19, the Chair postponed further proceedings on H.R. 6. |
2019-06-04 | House | The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule. |
2019-06-04 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with two hours of debate on H.R. 6. |
2019-06-04 | House | Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 6 with 2 hours of general debate. Motion to recommit with or without instructions allowed. |
2019-06-04 | House | Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 415. (consideration: CR H4265-4291) |
2019-06-04 | House | Rule H. Res. 415 passed House. |
2019-06-03 | House | Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 415 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 6 with 2 hours of general debate. Motion to recommit with or without instructions allowed. |
2019-04-08 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship. |
2019-03-12 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-03-12 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-03-12 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB874 (Related) 2019-03-26 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HB2821 (Related) 2019-05-30 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 72.
HB2820 (Related) 2019-05-30 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 73.
HR415 (Related) 2019-06-04 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB2821 (Related) 2019-05-30 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 72.
HB2820 (Related) 2019-05-30 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 73.
HR415 (Related) 2019-06-04 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Administrative remedies
Adoption and foster care
Africa
Citizenship and naturalization
Congressional oversight
Crime victims
Department of Homeland Security
Disability and paralysis
Domestic violence and child abuse
Elementary and secondary education
Foreign labor
Foreign language and bilingual programs
Government information and archives
Higher education
Homelessness and emergency shelter
Human trafficking
Immigration
Immigration status and procedures
Judicial review and appeals
Liberia
Licensing and registrations
Military personnel and dependents
Personnel records
Religion
Student aid and college costs
Student records
User charges and fees
Visas and passports
Vocational and technical education
Administrative remedies
Adoption and foster care
Africa
Citizenship and naturalization
Congressional oversight
Crime victims
Department of Homeland Security
Disability and paralysis
Domestic violence and child abuse
Elementary and secondary education
Foreign labor
Foreign language and bilingual programs
Government information and archives
Higher education
Homelessness and emergency shelter
Human trafficking
Immigration
Immigration status and procedures
Judicial review and appeals
Liberia
Licensing and registrations
Military personnel and dependents
Personnel records
Religion
Student aid and college costs
Student records
User charges and fees
Visas and passports
Vocational and technical education