US HB2821 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-30 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 72.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-30 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 72.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To authorize the cancellation of removal and adjustment of status of certain nationals of certain countries designated for temporary protected status or deferred enforced departure, and for other purposes.
Title
American Promise Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Nydia Velazquez [D-NY] | Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-30 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 72. |
2019-05-30 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 116-97. |
2019-05-22 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 20 - 9. |
2019-05-22 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-05-17 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2019-05-17 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB6 (Related) 2019-06-10 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 112.
HB2820 (Related) 2019-05-30 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 73.
HR415 (Similar To) 2019-06-04 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB2820 (Related) 2019-05-30 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 73.
HR415 (Similar To) 2019-06-04 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Administrative remedies
Business records
Citizenship and naturalization
Crime victims
Foreign labor
Foreign language and bilingual programs
Government information and archives
Health information and medical records
Immigration
Immigration status and procedures
Judicial review and appeals
Personnel records
Refugees, asylum, displaced persons
Student records
User charges and fees
Visas and passports
Administrative remedies
Business records
Citizenship and naturalization
Crime victims
Foreign labor
Foreign language and bilingual programs
Government information and archives
Health information and medical records
Immigration
Immigration status and procedures
Judicial review and appeals
Personnel records
Refugees, asylum, displaced persons
Student records
User charges and fees
Visas and passports