US HB5970 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on October 17 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-18 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Nutrition, Foreign Agriculture, and Horticulture.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Nutrition, Foreign Agriculture, and Horticulture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 17 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-18 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Nutrition, Foreign Agriculture, and Horticulture.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Nutrition, Foreign Agriculture, and Horticulture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Indian Self-Determination and Education Assistance Act to allow the Secretary of Agriculture to enter into self-determination contracts with Indian Tribes and Tribal organizations to carry out supplemental nutrition assistance programs.
Title
SNAP Tribal Food Sovereignty Act of 2023
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph Neguse [D-CO] | Rep. Tom Cole [R-OK] | Rep. Melanie Stansbury [D-NM] | Rep. Dusty Johnson [R-SD] |
Rep. Gabe Vasquez [D-NM] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-18 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Nutrition, Foreign Agriculture, and Horticulture. |
2023-10-25 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Agriculture. |
2023-10-17 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2912 (Related) 2023-09-21 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/house-bill/5970/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/hr5970/BILLS-118hr5970ih.pdf |